Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Crown Asset Management, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Wenner, Cheryl E, Wenner, John Doe, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Jeanette Dalton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeanette Dalton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 12: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; 09-9-03450-5; |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address 11: NOTICE OF ATTY CHANGE OF ADDRESS; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: Rahlfs, Roger Edward; |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Substitution of Counsel 10: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: Rahlfs, Roger Edward; |
|
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; COMMISSIONER THURMAN LOWANS; |
|
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 8: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 9: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; |
|
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Re Service Members Civil Relief 7: AFFIDAV/DECL RE: SVC MBR CIV RELIEF; |
|
February 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 6: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 4: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 5: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: KITSAP BANK , NFN; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.