Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Callen, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Linville, David E, against Contractors Bonding & Ins Bond #Si1119, Eddy, Jeffrey, represented by Yusen, Jeff H., in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Anna M. Laurie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnna M. Laurie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2010 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal 22: CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL; COMMISSIONER THURMAN LOWANS; |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 21: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING; | |
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel 20: NOTICE WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUT COUNSEL; |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Withdraw 19: NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW; |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense 16: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE; |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 17: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Substitution of Counsel 15: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; REISER, DOUGLAS SCOTT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.