Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kolivosky, Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Morgan, Danica Dawn, against Kenison, John Doe, Kenison, Katherine R, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Anna M. Laurie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnna M. Laurie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2011 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; | |
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE ANNA M. LAURIE, DEPT 3; |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 23: STIPULATION AND; |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement and Auth for Clerk to Strike Trial Date 22: NT STLMT/AUTH CLRK STRK TRIAL DATE; |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance of Trial Date ORD FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE; TRIAL 03/28/2011; JUDGE ANNA M. LAURIE, DEPT 3; |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 21: STIPULATION; |
|
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Re Evidentiary Rule 20: NOTICE RE: EVIDENTIARY RULE 904; |
|
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Assignment of Trial Date 19: ASSIGNMENT OF TRIAL DATE; 02-07-2011 9:00AM; |
|
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
T Trial Setting Calendar ASSIGNMENT OF TRIAL |
|
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Note for Calendar 18: NOTE FOR CALENDAR; 10-29-2010T; ASSIGNMENT OF TRIAL; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.