Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Deboodt, Yu Ting, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Cogan, Peter Geoffrey, against Chen, Benny, Mandarin Chinese Restaurant Llc, Liang, Chun Hsiang, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Kevin D. Hull presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin D. Hull Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2010 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal 14: CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL; JUDGE KEVIN D. HULL, DEPT 6; |
|
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING; | |
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 13: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Report 12: REPORT STATUS - PLAINTIFF; |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 11: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING; | |
February 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer 10: ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM; |
|
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing 9: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.