Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank Usa, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer, P.S., against Sheriff, David G, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Anna M. Laurie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnna M. Laurie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE ANNA M. LAURIE, DEPT 3; |
|
September 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 20: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; |
|
September 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 18: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
September 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Re Service Members Civil Relief 19: AFFIDAV/DECL RE: SVC MBR CIV RELIEF; |
|
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 17: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 2ND; |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 16: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 15: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: HUGHESTECH NW , NFN; |
|
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 14: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Re Service Members Civil Relief 12: AFFIDAV/DECL RE: SVC MBR CIV RELIEF; |
|
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 13: MOTION HEARING; MOTIONS GRANTED; ORDERS SIGNED; JUDGE THEODORE F SPEARMAN DEPT 4; COURT REPORTER NICKIE DRURY; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.