Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ford Motor Credit Co, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Doe 1, Rockford, Tim B, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Anna M. Laurie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnna M. Laurie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Release 17: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARN - FULL; |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Release 16: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARN - PARTIAL; |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 15: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 13: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 14: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: QUALSTAR CU , NFN; |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address 12: NOTICE OF ATTY CHANGE OF ADDRESS; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: White, Krista L; |
|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Release 11: RELEASE OF WRIT; |
|
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 10: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 9: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: QUALSTAR CU , NFN; |
|
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 8: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.