Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Haynes, Christy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcgonagle, William Sargent, against Clearbrook Inn Living Center, Glick, Reece, represented by Wright, Joel Evans, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Kevin D. Hull presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin D. Hull Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2009 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated 19: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - STIPULATED; JUDGE KEVIN D. HULL, DEPT 6; |
|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice 18: NOTICE OF STRIKING FROM TRIAL; SETTING CALENDAR; |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
T Trial Setting Calendar ARBITRATION SETTING |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability 17: RENOTE FOR TRIAL & STMNT OF ARB; 02-15-2013T; ARBITRATION SETTING; |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer and Counterclaim 16: ANSWER & COUNTER CLAIM; |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED -CNTRCLAIM; ATTY FOR DEFENDANT: Wright, Joel Evans; | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice 15: NOTICE STRIKING FROM TRIAL SET CAL; |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
T Trial Setting Calendar ARBITRATION SETTING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.