Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank Usa, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer, P.S., against Kroger, Vanessa D, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Anna M. Laurie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnna M. Laurie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 19: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE ANNA M. LAURIE, DEPT 3; |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order 18: AGREED ORDER RE JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
M Motion Docket SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; COMMISSIONER THURMAN LOWANS; |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order for Exam 16: ORDER FOR EXAM; 12-02-2011M; SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 17: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause 15: MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR; A JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment 13: JUDGMENT ON STIPULATION; JUDGE RUSSELL W. HARTMAN, DEPT 6; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.