Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Country Properties, Llc, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Irwin, Patrick Mcgettigan, against Jefferson County, represented by Hunsucker, Philip Carl, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, WA, . Jefferson County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJefferson County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Report | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default
Judge: Harper, Keith C |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.