Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Captain Alaska Fish Co Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Gibbons, Steven V., against Hogan, John Campbell Mike, Majestic Acres Llc, represented by Schodowski, Joseph J., in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, WA, . Jefferson County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 10, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJefferson County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Forbes, Micky |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons John Cambell Mike Hogan |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons To Majestic Acres LLC |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.