Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Klein, Joanna N, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Twersky, Jeffrey, against Bernt Ericsen Excavating, Inc., Ericsen, Bernt Paul, Ericsen, Jane Doe, Klein, Edgar Stuart, represented by Liekhus, Lisa Ann, Simmons, Bret S., in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, WA, . Jefferson County, WA Superior Courts with Keith C. Harper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeith C. Harper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2020 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Harper, Keith C |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name Change |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Mailing Address |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.