Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Morris, Jessica J, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Schodowski, Joseph J., against Hansen, Trevor, Jefferson County, Jefferson County Sheriff'S Department, represented by Dynan, Mark J., Hunsucker, Philip Carl, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, WA, . Jefferson County, WA Superior Courts with Brandon Mack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrandon Mack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2020 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12
Judge: Mack, Brandon R |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12
Judge: Mack, Brandon R |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Harper, Keith C |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Re: Arbitrator Fees |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Harper, Keith C |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Increase in Attrorneys fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.