Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Metis Group, Llc, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Seaman, Shane Richard, against Hastings Development, Llc, Hastings Landing, Llc, Hastings Estate Company, represented by Pierce, Britenae M. C., in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, WA, . Jefferson County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2019 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJefferson County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Judge: Harper, Keith C |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Receipt |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Correspondence From Clerk changing Venue |
|
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Change of Venue | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Baratuci, Eileen |
|
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Change Venue |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Harry Dudley in Support of Def's Mot for Partial Summary Judgment |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Briten Pierce in Support oof Def's Mot for Partial Summary Judgment |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.