Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Roethle, Aaron, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case against Port Townsend Paper Corporation, represented by Cottnair, David Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, WA, . Jefferson County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2020 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationJefferson County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12
Judge: Harper, Keith C |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Harper, Keith C |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Court Administrator |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Denying Motion Petition | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Harper, Keith C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.