Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Valley National Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kumar, Hari, against Does 1-10, Rkj Trucking Llc, in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Christon C. Skinner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChriston C. Skinner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Default
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.