Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hood, Eric, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case represented by Crittenden, William John, against The City Of Langley, represented by Goldman, Jessica L., Soto, Ann Marie Josephine, in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Christon C. Skinner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChriston C. Skinner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryPra Public Records Act |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit PURSUANT TO GR17A2 |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Objection Opposition TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Courts Decision
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO RCW 42.56.550 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.