Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sutliff, Blaine, Sutliff, Kristine, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Linville, Christian, against M M Holdings Whidbey Holdings Inc, Peters, Michael, Peters, Paula, Windermere Real Estate South Whidbey, represented by Cohen, Jacob, Neste, Lars E, in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Christon C. Skinner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChriston C. Skinner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial 2 DAYS 9:30 AM Judge: Cliff, Carolyn L |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement and Auth for Clerk to Strike Trial Date | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Received BY MAIL AT 1:00 PM |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Brief DEFENDANT M&M WHIDBEY HOLDINGS INC |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Hearing
Judge: Cliff, Carolyn L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.