Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Krieg Construction Inc, Waldron, Steven, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Thompson, Nikki Christine, against Anderson, Christian, Garry Oaks Llc, represented by Gibbs, G. Geoffrey, Sempel, Teva, in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Carolyn Cliff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn Cliff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Release SECURITY Judge: Cliff, Carolyn L |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Destroyed PER 09/30/2022 STIPULATION |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Lien FULL SATISFACTION OF CLAIM OF LIEN |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW Judge: Churchill, Vickie I |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Court Decision After Trial | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Churchill, Vickie I |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Cliff, Carolyn L |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing ENTRY OF PROPOSED ORDERS Judge: Cliff, Carolyn L |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Response |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.