Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ray, Kristine Yvonne, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Campbell, Joshua Earl, against Doe, Jane, Doe, John, Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Marshall, Jessica Marie, Donohue, Alfred E, in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2020 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Churchill, Vickie I |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Churchill, Vickie I |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte
Judge: Cliff, Carolyn L |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.