Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jacobs, Stephen K., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Simmons, Julia Ellen, Esq, against Does 1-10 Inclusive, Washington State Housing Finance Commission, Loan Care Llc, Alabama Housing Finance Authority, represented by Evanson, Kymberly Kathryn, Mcintosh, Joseph Ward, Dingler, Wilhelm, in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2020 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Statistical Completion | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Petition for Removal to US District Court | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service WITH ANDREW BYRUM |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.