Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fee, Dennis, Fee, Elizabeth, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Vernon, Gregory Paul, against Ck & Associates Llc, Hammond, John Doe, Hammond, Robyn, Higbee Family Trust, Higbee, John Doe, (total of 11) See All represented by Neste, Lars E, Osborn, Christopher Robert, Tingvall, Douglas S., in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Christon C. Skinner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChriston C. Skinner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2019 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial 2ND SET 5 DAYS 9:30 AM Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing SPECIAL SET 3/3/2021 3:00PM Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment
Judge: Hancock, Alan R |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Readiness Hearing
Judge: Cliff, Carolyn L |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Readiness Hearing
Judge: Churchill, Vickie I |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance
Judge: Cliff, Carolyn L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.