Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Moore, Kay F., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Scott, Andrew Franklin, against Goose Community Grocer, The, Goosefoot, Myers Group Llc, The, represented by Tavares, Christine E., in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Vickie I. Churchill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVickie I. Churchill Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2019 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Churchill, Vickie I |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte
Judge: Cliff, Carolyn L |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Churchill, Vickie I |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Oath and Approval of Judge Pro Tempore Stipulation | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Judge: Harvey, H. Clarke |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Harvey, H. Clarke |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF DEF REPLY TO PLT OPPOSITION TO DEF MT FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.