Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Schoolcraft, William, Schoolcraft, Anna, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Wells, Ben W., against Kristopherson Farm Llc, Canopy Tours Northwest Llc, represented by Cannon, Eron Zachary, in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2019 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 10 DAYS 9:30 AM Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Readiness Hearing
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Date READINESS 11/08/2021 ; JURY TRIAL 12/07/2021 10 DAYS 9:30 AM |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Assignment for Trial Setting | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice for Trial Setting | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter or Notice of Schedule Conflict | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 10 DAYS; 9:30 AM Judge: Hancock, Alan R |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Hancock, Alan R |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER & MT TO QUASH NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Judge: Hancock, Alan R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.