Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Boe, Edwina M, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Waller, Michael Mert, against All Other Occupants, Randall, James, in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Alan R. Hancock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan R. Hancock Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2015 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Writ 11: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT; |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 10: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Restitution 9: WRIT OF RESTITUTION; |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 8: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE ALAN R. HANCOCK; COURT REPORTER JEANNE M WELLS; |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment 7: JUDGMENT; JUDGE ALAN R. HANCOCK; |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
LH Civil Motions SHOW CAUSE |
|
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 6: RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause 4: MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.