Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rahlfs, Roger Edward, against Rennes, Jane Doe & Marital Comm, Rennes, Louann & Marital Comm, Rennes, Marlon R, in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Alan R. Hancock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan R. Hancock Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2012 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address 10: NOTICE OF ATTY CHANGE OF ADDRESS; |
|
May 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 9: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 8: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 7: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 6: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; JUDGE ALAN R. HANCOCK; |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Statement 4: STATEMENT -NON MILITARY; |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default 5: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons 2: SUMMONS; |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 3: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.