Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Byrne, Michael John filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2021 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Cotton, Jean A |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing to Modify/Terminate Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion and Affidavit Declaration | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection
Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Protection Order
Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.