Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Moss, Lester, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Stewart, William James, against Mohr, Marco, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with Katherine L. Svoboda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKatherine L. Svoboda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2021 |
CategoryUnd Residential Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Restitution | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Summary
Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause - Unlawful Detainer Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Statistical Completion | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Cost Bill | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.