Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Maxwell, Bruce A, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case against Doe, Jane, Doe, Pat, Grays Harbor Transportation, represented by Willmes, Charles Albert, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Judge: Cotton, Jean A |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial
Judge: Judge, Odyssey |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SETTLEMENT |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference
Judge: Edwards, David L |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address of Counsel |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing to set trial date Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial Date | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Trial Date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.