Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Strandhytte Llc, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Sweeney, Matthew Laurence, against City Of Westport, represented by Hagen, Wayne Delos, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with Katherine L. Svoboda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKatherine L. Svoboda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2021 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint amended |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Lyle Fox |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.