Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bradshaw, Don, Bradshaw, Jane T, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carr, Harold D., against Fruit Growers Supply Company, Shorey, Thomas E, represented by Floyd, Francis Stanley, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with David L. Mistachkin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid L. Mistachkin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.