Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barnhart Logging, Barnhart, Steve, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Eller, Travis Scott, against Pacific Logging & Processing Inc, represented by Kee, C Scott, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with Katherine L. Svoboda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKatherine L. Svoboda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Travis Eller |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.