Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
The Sherwin-Williams Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Siderius, Frank Raymond, against American Contractors Indemnity Company, B&Mz Construction Llc, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts with Tyson R. Hill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTyson R. Hill Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2021 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Dismissing Litigant | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Default & JUDGMENT AS TO DEF CONTRACTOR ONLY Judge: Hill, Tyson R |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF NIKKE L GRISSO IN SUPT OF SUM CERTAIN DUE |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default AS TO DEF CONTRACTOR'S BOND PROCEEDS ONLY |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.