Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Palmer Farms Inc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bevier, Trevor Ryan, against National Food Corporation, represented by Fisher, Bradley L., in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts with Middleton, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMiddleton, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Litigant
Judge: Middleton, Thomas W |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.