Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
L & M Trinidad Llc, Ravassipour, Linda, Ravassipour, Mansour, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Hotchkiss, Tyler D, against All Other Occupants, Emerald Sea Of Green Inc, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts with John D. Knodell, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn D. Knodell, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2021 |
CategoryUnd Commercial Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause (PLTF)(2) Judge: Knodell, John D, III |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause (PLTF)(2) |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause (PLTF)(2) |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit RICHARD CLARK |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.