Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Johns, Carol, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Fielding, Spencer Bowen, against Walmart, Inc, represented by Rosholt, Andrea Jo, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Knodell, John D, III |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Arbitration Settlement and Removal from Arbitration Calendar | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address - FIELDING LAW GROUP |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM COURT ADMIN TO COUNSEL |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Hill, Tyson R |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM COURT ADMIN TO COUNSEL |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Statement STATUS |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.