Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Andrade, Angel, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Bodien, India, against Beef Northwest Feeders Llc, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts with John D. Knodell, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn D. Knodell, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice
Judge: Knodell, John D, III |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss STIPULATED |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.