Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Citadel Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ross, Allison Kay, against Agri-Fix Towing I I Llc, Agri-Fix Towing Llc, C & V Auto Sales & Service Inc, Saletta, Anthony M, represented by Ries, Christopher F., in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts with John D. Knodell, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn D. Knodell, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2020 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation COUNSEL NOTIFIED-UNTIMELY |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause (PLTF)(24) Judge: Knodell, John D, III |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Knodell, John D, III |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application FOR DELIVERY OF PROPERTY TO PLTF & VERIFYING COMPLAINT (AMENDED AS TO EXHIBITS A-C) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.