Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Stumpf, Ellen, Stumph, Gene, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Larson, Larry Washburn, against Adamy, Gabriel M, Leal, Hector, Lexon Insurance Co, represented by Harrison, Frank Stuart, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts with John D. Knodell, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn D. Knodell, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2020 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal AUTHORIZING TENDER DISBURSEMENT & EXONERATION OF BOND & RESERVATION OF RIGHTS OF SURETY Judge: Knodell, John D, III |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket *SPECIAL SET 7-6-21 @ 3:00 PM W/JDK* |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum PLAINTIFF'S MM IN SUPPORT OF MT FOR SUMAMRY JUDGMENT |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment
Judge: Knodell, John D, III |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Default
Judge: Knodell, John D, III |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.