Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ruiz, Cipriano R, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Childers, Christopher Luke, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by O'Connell, Thomas Francis, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts with John D. Knodell, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn D. Knodell, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2020 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Knodell, John D, III |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ARBITRATION SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF REMOVAL FROM CALENDAR |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ARBITRATION HEARING DATE |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter TO ARBITRATOR |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM COURT ADMIN RE ARBITRATION |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order TRANSFERRING CASE INTO MANDATORY ARBITRATION Judge: Estudillo, David G |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing RE ARBITRATION (CRT) |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit DAVID R. LAW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.