Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Baumberger, Cynthia, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Earl, Corbin, Mckean, John L., against Alvarado, Gilbert, City Of Moses Lake, represented by Michael, Suzanne Kelly, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts with Tyson R. Hill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTyson R. Hill Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2020 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction AND RELEASE OF ATTORNEY'S LIEN |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Hill, Tyson R |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Attorneys Claim of Lien | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order (DEF-ALVARADO)(20) |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice RE WEBEX |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF PRESENTATION OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.