Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
J & B Construction And Landscaping, Co., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Froehlich, Michael Allen, against Quincy School District, The Guarantee Company Of North America U, Barry Hayes Construction, Llc, represented by Greene, Andrew Latimer, Sokol, Jan D, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2020 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Middleton, Thomas W |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer to Counter Claim | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default PLTF(8) |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer Affirmative Defense and Counter or Cross Claim | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings ORDER FOR DEFAULT |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certification PURSUANT TO RCW 60.28.030 |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.