Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lyman, Teena, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Graber, Tyler William, against Nationstar Mortgage, represented by Balser, Justin Donald, in the jurisdiction of Garfield County, WA, . Garfield County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationGarfield County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Stipulated motion and order of voluntary dismissal w/prejudice Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney and substitution of counsel |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Stipulation for Leave to File Amended Answer Judge: Cox, Thomas W |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Leave to File Amended Answer |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plantiff's Complaint |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Cox, Thomas W |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket Amended to June 17th |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion and Memorandum to Strike Answer |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Tyler Graber |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.