Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The Estate Of Ruth Hart, Et Al, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Ortuno, Paul Ryan, against Garfield County Public Hospital District, represented by Lamberson, Stephen Maurice, in the jurisdiction of Garfield County, WA, . Garfield County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2019 |
CategoryMed Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGarfield County, WA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Stipulation Judge: Cox, Thomas W |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Cox, Thomas W |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continuance on plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continuance on Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Carl Tabor RN, BSN, CWCN, NHA in opposition to motion for summary judgment by Def, Garfield County Public Hosp. Dist. |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order of Support on Plaintiff's opposition to Def's motion for summary judgment and cross motion for summary judgment |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of P. Ryan Ortuno in opposition to motion for summary judgment by Def, Garfield County Public Hospital Dist. |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of S. Daniel Seltzer, MD in opposition to motion for summary judgment by Def, Garfield County Public Hosp. Dist. |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's opposition to Def's motion for summary judgment and cross motion for summary judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.