Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Morgan, Iris M, Morgan, Ronald E, in the jurisdiction of Garfield County, WA, . Garfield County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2016 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGarfield County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order for voluntary dismissal of entire action |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion voluntary dismissal of entire action |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order for alternative service |
|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Arrest Detention Probable Cause for alternative service |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Military Service | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Military Service 4: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE; |
|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons 2: SUMMONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER; |
|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Re Dependent of a Person in Military Service 3: NT RE: DEPENDENT OF MILITARY PERSON; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.