Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Lara, John Doe, Lara, Rhonda S, in the jurisdiction of Garfield County, WA, . Garfield County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2013 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGarfield County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order dismissing case |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for dismissing case |
|
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduled -: NOTE FOR CALENDAR; 10-06-2016; DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested -: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Note for Calendar -: NOTE FOR CALENDAR; 10-06-2016; DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing 6: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; |
|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 5: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion 4: MOTION FOR ORDER OF DEFAULT AND; JUDGMENT; |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit 3: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIERS AND; SAILORS CIVIL RELIEF ACT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.