Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Watson, Dean, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Lyle, Bruce, The Estate Of Lynann Lyle, in the jurisdiction of Garfield County, WA, . Garfield County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2013 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGarfield County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing 14: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; |
|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice 13: NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW; |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing 12: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion 10: MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING HEARING; |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order 11: ORDER STRIKING HEARING; |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Hearing Minutes -: COURT HEARING MINUTES; |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Note for Calendar -: NOTE FOR CALENDAR; MOTION HEARING; |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order 9: ORDER CONTINUING HEARING; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.