Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rodriguez Ortiz, Jasmin, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Fielding, Spencer Bowen, against Garcia, Alexander, Ray Poland And Sons, Inc., represented by Chan, Kenneth, Kobluk, Gerald, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts with Samuel P. Swanberg presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel P. Swanberg Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Arbitration | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction OF ARBITRATION AWARD |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial Length TBD |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Management Hearing Time TBD Judge: Hevel, David R |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Time TBD Judge: Hevel, David R |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.