Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Brittney Boles As Personal Representative Of The Estate Of James Boles, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Mickelsen, Stephen Brent, against Cisneros, Oscar, John Does 1 Through 10, La Storages, Llc., Leal, Enemesio, represented by Stocker, Steven Robert, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts with Joseph M. Burrowes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph M. Burrowes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryWde Wrongful Death |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Length TBD |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Management Hearing 8:30am Judge: Burrowes, Joseph M |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference 9:30am Judge: Stam, Jacqueline I |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Statistical Completion | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Stam, Jacqueline I |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Stam, Jacqueline I |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DATE |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Date / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF PRE-TRIAL MANAGEMENT HEARING |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS Judge: Stam, Jacqueline I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.