Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bowen, Brett, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Celski, Jason Allan, against Corporations I-V, Pemco Insurance Agency Inc., Dunham, Esten E., represented by Murphy, Megan, Stocker, Steven Robert, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Runge, Carrie L |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice AND STIPULATION Judge: Runge, Carrie L |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Schedule |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.