Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Balderas, Marianne, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcpartland, Bryce Patrick, against Agrium Us Inc, Crop Production Services Inc, Doe, John, Munoz-Navarro, Ismael, Nutrien Ag Solutions Inc, (total of 6) See All represented by Wallace, Gregory G, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts with Jacqueline Stam presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacqueline Stam Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2020 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Length TBD |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Management Hearing Time TBD Judge: Hevel, David R |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Time TBD |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Stam, Jacqueline I |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice DEFENDANT MELISSA VALENCIA Judge: Stam, Jacqueline I |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Petersen, David L |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Party FOR DEFENDANTS NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS INC, CROP PRODUCTIONS SERVICES INC, AGRIUM US INC, AND ISMAEL MUNOZ-NAVARRO ONLY Judge: Petersen, David L |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order PROPOSED FOR DISMISSAL ONLY FOR DEF'T |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.